Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Viola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salto, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1893Born
22 Apr 191623.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 193643.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Salto, Uruguay
25 Jul 193643.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitylius
23 Aug 193643.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitylius
29 May 194047.1SucceededBishop of Salto, Uruguay
1 Jan 196874.7ResignedBishop of Salto, Uruguay
1 Jan 196874.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
28 Nov 197077.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Badiae
11 Aug 197279.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Viola
Bishop Alfredo Viola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018