Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Mendiharat Pommies

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1914BornOstabat-Asme, France
22 Jul 194531.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 195944.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Salto, Uruguay
3 Feb 195944.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zerta
18 May 195945.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zerta
1 Jan 196853.7SucceededBishop of Salto, Uruguay
8 Mar 198974.8RetiredBishop of Salto, Uruguay
12 Jun 200793.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Mendiharat Pommies:
Bishop Marcelo Mendiharat Pommies (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salto

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 45
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013