Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Tonna Zanotta

Deceased

Bishop of Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1912BornSalto
28 Oct 193422.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 196048.1AppointedBishop of Florida, Uruguay
24 Sep 196048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Florida, Uruguay
16 Jun 198775.0RetiredBishop of Florida, Uruguay
9 Dec 199482.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Florida, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Umberto Tonna Zanotta:
Bishop Umberto Tonna Zanotta (born , died ) Bishop of Florida

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013