Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique José Mühn, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jujuy, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Castellum Medianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1897Born
20 Sep 193033.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Sep 193437.5AppointedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
17 Feb 193537.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
11 Mar 193538.0InstalledBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
2 Aug 196568.4ResignedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
2 Aug 196568.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
21 Jul 196669.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Jujuy, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Enrique José Mühn
Bishop Enrique José Mühn S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jujuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Jerónimo

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast