Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eustachio Dentice, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1766BornPollena
29 May 179023.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181851.6SelectedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
6 Apr 181851.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
12 Apr 181851.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
1830¹63.4DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustachio Dentice
Archbishop Eustachio Dentice C.R. (born , died 1830) Archbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste)

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1828
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 May 2016