Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marco Antonio De Marco

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1678³BornOtranto
1 Apr 170224.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 172042.2AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
28 Apr 172042.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
21 Mar 172547.1AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
Apr 1742³64.2DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio De Marco:
Archbishop Marco Antonio De Marco (born , died Apr 1742) Archbishop of Manfredonia

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 358, and Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015