Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Ricci

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1498Born
25 Jun 154445.6AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
27 Jun 154445.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
20 Feb 154546.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Chiusi, Italy
4 Mar 155051.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
20 Nov 155153.0Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155153.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
19 Nov 155456.0ResignedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
10 Nov 156163.0AppointedAdministrator of Montepulciano, Italy
9 Jan 156263.1ResignedAdministrator of Montepulciano, Italy
30 Jan 156667.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
7 Oct 156667.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
3 Sep 156768.8AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
3 Jul 157071.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
8 Apr 157374.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
3 May 157475.5DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ricci (VIAF: 172800690)
Giovanni Cardinal Ricci (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Sacrisity, S. Pietro in Montorio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 22.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 10*
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018