Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Beniamino Feuli

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1820Born
6 Apr 184423.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188059.1AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
19 Mar 188059.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
19 Jan 188463.0DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Feuli (VIAF: 89474479)
Archbishop Beniamino Feuli (born , died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSt Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017