Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horatio Annibaldi della Molara

Deceased

Bishop of Manfredonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1585³Born
22 Feb 161125.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Feb 163044.3AppointedBishop of Manfredonia, Italy
19 Mar 163044.4Ordained BishopBishop of Manfredonia, Italy
7 May 164357.5DiedBishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Horatio Annibaldi della Molara
Bishop Horatio Annibaldi della Molara (born , died ) Bishop of Manfredonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopPauline Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Manfredonia, Archdiocese of Manfredonia

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 316
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 30
  • b/c2: AT, 21 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast