Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Riccardo Ruotolo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

Titular Bishop of Castulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1928BornAndria
15 Jul 195122.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 199567.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy
6 Dec 199567.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castulo
6 Jan 199667.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castulo
28 Feb 200475.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
1 Aug 201283.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Ruotolo:
Bishop Riccardo Ruotolo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,651
  • d: CB, 1 Aug 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013