Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹Born
14 Feb 165061.1AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
24 Feb 165061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
Aug 1656³67.5DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Rossi
Bishop Alessandro Rossi (born 1589, died Aug 1656) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 17 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast