Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Morales, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornLucerna, Spain
10 Mar 165951.1AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
16 Mar 165951.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
7 Feb 166759.0AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
10 Jan 168173.0DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Morales:
Bishop Luis Morales O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Tropea

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95, and Page 347
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 190, Number 1,191
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015