Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Aguado de Valdés, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
10 Jun 160816.4ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
26 May 164250.4AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
1 Jun 164250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
10 Jul 164553.5DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Aguado de Valdés
Bishop Andrés Aguado de Valdés O.S.A. (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopSant'Agostino in Campo Marzio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 171, Number 1,068
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 42
  • b/c2: AT, 19 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018