Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottaviano Praeconio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1546AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
13 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
18 Mar 1562AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
18 Aug 1568DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Praeconio
Archbishop Ottaviano Praeconio O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 117
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018