Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Saverio Pirelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1726Born
13 Apr 175427.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 176034.1AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
27 Jul 176034.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
16 Dec 179165.5SelectedBishop of Ariano, Italy
23 Mar 179265.8ResignedBishop of Sarno, Italy
26 Mar 179265.8ConfirmedBishop of Ariano, Italy
12 Mar 180376.8DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Saverio Pirelli
Bishop Giovanni Saverio Pirelli (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018