Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Ippoliti

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1480AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
5 Sep 1481AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
18 Jan 1493AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Città di Castello, Italy
10 Jan 1498AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ariano, Italy
1511²DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Ippoliti
Archbishop Nicola Ippoliti (died 1511) Bishop of Ariano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 224, and Page 94
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 130
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1480, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast