Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Spalletti

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1792BornMonte Bufo
21 Sep 181623.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 184048.0AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
27 Dec 184048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
12 Jan 185057.1DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Spalletti (VIAF: 89577832)
Bishop Francesco Spalletti (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016