Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebio Magner, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1823Born
1 Nov 184017.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Nov 184623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 May 188157.5AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
22 May 188157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
25 Sep 188258.8AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
15 Aug 188460.7DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eusebio Magner (VIAF: 89301059)
Bishop Eusebio Magner O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontesanto, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,882
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,881, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast