Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasio Zuber, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Patna

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1824BornVienna, Austria
1 Jul 184824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Mar 185429.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
8 Mar 185429.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
9 Jul 185430.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
8 Dec 185935.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
14 May 187247.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Patna, India

MicroData Summary for Atanasio Zuber (VIAF: 292458276)
Bishop Atanasio Zuber O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Patna

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 132
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016