Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Zaffino

Deceased

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1824Born
30 Jul 187551.1AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
7 Nov 187551.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
29 Apr 189267.9AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
7 Feb 189570.6DiedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Zaffino
Archbishop Giuseppe Zaffino (born , died ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorfu
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017