Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Corradi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Raffaele de la Conception Benoit)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1810Born
22 Dec 183222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
20 Dec 186757.6AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
16 Feb 186857.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
8 Jan 188473.6DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Corradi (VIAF: 88752741)
Bishop Raffaele Corradi O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Remo
Ordained BishopS. Maria de la Scala, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,868, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast