Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Bianchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1827Born
21 Sep 185023.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 187244.8AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
11 Aug 187244.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
30 Dec 188962.2ResignedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
30 Dec 188962.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
1905¹77.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Bianchi (VIAF: 88793459)
Bishop Raffaele Bianchi (born , died 1905) Bishop Emeritus of Chiusi e Pienza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePienza, Diocese of Chiusi e Pienza
Ordained BishopSs. Vincent et Anastase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212, and Page 331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017