Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrija Ilić (Illiich)

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1827Born
30 Jul 185023.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
3 Aug 185023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
19 Sep 187548.3SelectedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
7 Apr 187648.8ConfirmedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
27 Aug 187649.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
1888¹60.6DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrija Ilić (Illiich) (VIAF: 305714973)
Bishop Andrija Ilić (Illiich) (born , died 1888) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrarigrad, Diocese of Hvar (Lesina)
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017