Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bugliari

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dausara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1813Born
Apr 1837³24.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 187562.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dausara
7 Nov 187562.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dausara
1 Sep 188875.4DiedTitular Bishop of Dausara

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bugliari
Bishop Giuseppe Bugliari (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Dausara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSofia di Epiro
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 239
  • op: CB, 14 Jul 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017