Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Metti, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1816Born
1834¹17.4ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
22 Dec 183822.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
25 May 183922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
29 Jul 187256.0AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
11 Aug 187256.0Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
4 Sep 187458.1DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Metti (VIAF: 2284896)
Bishop Giulio Metti C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSs. Vincent et Anastase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017