Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sena

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1814Born
2 Oct 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 187258.7AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
1 Jan 187358.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
20 Mar 188772.9DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sena (VIAF: 89460876)
Bishop Antonio Sena (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontemarano, Diocese of Nusco
Ordained BishopSan Agostino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 125
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,744
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017