Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose Notyn Darauni

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Adana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1828Born
28 May 187547.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
30 May 187547.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
26 Mar 187849.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Adana

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Notyn Darauni
Archbishop Ambrose Notyn Darauni (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Adana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaraun
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74
  • d: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Mar 2017