Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venanzio Mobili

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Bishop of Thebae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1819Born
18 Dec 184122.5Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 1873³53.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
16 Jan 187454.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thebae
25 Jan 187454.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thebae
22 Aug 187556.2DiedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Venanzio Mobili
Bishop Venanzio Mobili (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopSt Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 545
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Mar 2017