Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Caiazzo, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1805Born
3 Oct 182621.3ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
13 Jun 182924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
23 Dec 187267.6AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
1 Jan 187367.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
25 Jul 188378.1DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Caiazzo
Archbishop Giuseppe Caiazzo O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSan Agostino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 311
  • c34: CB, 28 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,743
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast