Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Franceschini

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1832BornSpello
22 Mar 185623.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186734.3AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
7 Apr 186734.3Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
31 May 188148.5DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Franceschini:
Bishop Gaetano Franceschini (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013