Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Balgy, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Achrida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1814Born
16 Apr 187762.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
20 May 187762.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
5 Dec 188470.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Achrida

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Balgy (VIAF: 316419448)
Archbishop Alessandro Balgy C.M.V. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Achrida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017