Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Ghiurekian, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1833Born
1854¹20.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
1876¹42.8AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
8 May 187744.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
20 May 187744.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
3 Dec 192188.8DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Ghiurekian
Archbishop Ignazio Ghiurekian C.M.V. (born , died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrebisonda
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 560
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017