Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvator (Pietro) Saba, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Cartagine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1795Born
7 Sep 181217.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Aug 181822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Sep 186267.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
5 Oct 186267.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
29 May 1863³67.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvator (Pietro) Saba
Archbishop Salvator (Pietro) Saba O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Cartagine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOzieri
Ordained BishopImm. Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017