Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Sorgente

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1825BornSalerno
23 Sep 184822.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 187448.4AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
17 May 187448.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
2 Oct 191185.8DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Sorgente:
Archbishop Camillo Sorgente (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,311
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 235
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013