Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Domenico Marinangeli

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1831Born
19 Oct 185625.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188250.6AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
2 Apr 188250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
16 Jan 189361.4AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
5 Feb 189866.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
6 Mar 192189.5DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for Domenico Marinangeli (VIAF: 89594905)
Patriarch Domenico Marinangeli (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca di Cambio, Diocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 87, and Page 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 561
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017