Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Oraboni, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Apr 1570AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
17 Mar 1572AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
10 May 1575DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Oraboni
Archbishop Angelo Oraboni O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Archbishop of Trani

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158, and Page 317
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,570, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast