Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Maria de Franci, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1763BornNapoli
21 Dec 178522.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 182258.9SelectedArchbishop of Trani e Bisceglie, Italy
19 Apr 182259.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani e Bisceglie, Italy
21 Apr 182259.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani e Bisceglie, Italy
26 Jun 184784.3DiedArchbishop of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria de Franci
Archbishop Gaetano Maria de Franci C.R.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 561
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1822, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016