Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan (Giovanni) de Rada, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
17 Aug 160560.6AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
11 Sep 1605³60.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
16 Jan 160661.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Patti, Italy
Jan 1609³64.0DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan (Giovanni) de Rada (VIAF: 42950846)
Archbishop Juan (Giovanni) de Rada O.F.M. Obs. (born 1545, died Jan 1609) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTauste, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aracoeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 341, and Page 270
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 120, Number 763
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 12
  • c2: AT, 12 Mar 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017