Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cosma Cardinal Orsini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420¹BornRome
1 Apr 147858.2AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
15 May 148060.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 1480³60.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
3 Jun 148060.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
21 Nov 148161.8DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosma Orsini:
Cosma Cardinal Orsini O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Trani

  • a cardinal for 1.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 May 1480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015