Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Astorgio Agnesi

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1391²Born
18 Sep 141120.7AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
15 Feb 141322.1AppointedBishop of Ravello, Italy
25 Jan 141827.0AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
6 Mar 141928.1AppointedBishop of Ancona, Italy
19 Oct 142231.7AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
8 Feb 143645.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
20 Dec 144857.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 144958.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
10 Oct 145160.7DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Astorgio Agnesi (VIAF: 358145857935723021451)
Archbishop Astorgio Agnesi (born 1391, died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 2.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 414, and Page 335
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 341, and Page 88
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 104
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Aug 2021

Quantcast