Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfranco Todisco, P.O.C.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1946 Born
4 Oct 196822.5ProfessedMember of Pious Workers Rural Catechists
5 Dec 197024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pious Workers Rural Catechists
13 Dec 200256.7AppointedBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy
8 Feb 200356.8Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy
21 Apr 201771.0ResignedBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco Todisco
Bishop Gianfranco Todisco P.O.C.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,324
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017