Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Camassa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Trapezopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1835Born
18 Sep 185823.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 188146.1AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
14 Aug 188146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
15 Apr 191276.8ResignedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
15 Apr 191276.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezopolis
18 Jan 191680.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Camassa
Archbishop Giuseppe Camassa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce, Diocese of Lecce
Ordained BishopSS. Trinità al Monte Pincio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017