Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Campanella, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1581Born
12 Jan 165472.3AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
18 Jan 165472.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
10 Jan 166381.2DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Campanella
Bishop Domenico Campanella O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePutigliano

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 116, Number 710
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018