Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Lollino

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹Born
29 Jul 159639.5AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
18 Aug 159639.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno, Italy
28 Mar 162568.2DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Lollino (VIAF: 15586414)
Bishop Luigi Lollino (born 1557, died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,362
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast