Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ippolito Cardinal de’ Medici

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Administrator of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1511BornFlorence
10 Jan 152917.7AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
10 Jan 152917.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jan 152917.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
15 Nov 152918.6AppointedAdministrator of Casale Monferrato, Italy
6 Mar 153119.9ResignedAdministrator of Casale Monferrato, Italy
3 Jul 153221.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
26 Jul 153221.3AppointedAdministrator of Monreale, Italy
20 Apr 153423.0AppointedAdministrator of Lecce, Italy
26 Feb 153523.9ResignedAdministrator of Lecce, Italy
10 Aug 153524.3DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Ippolito de’ Medici:
Cardinal Ippolito de’ Medici (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a cardinal for 6.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Jan 1529
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013