Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Périer, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avignon

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

Note/Previous Titular See: (Constitutionnel of Puy-de-Dome)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1740BornGrenoble
25 May 176625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Feb 179150.7SelectedBishop
27 Mar 179150.8Ordained BishopBishop
11 Oct 1801³61.3ResignedBishop
9 Apr 180261.8SelectedBishop of Avignon, France
30 Apr 180261.9ConfirmedBishop of Avignon, France
27 Sep 181777.3RetiredBishop of Avignon, France
30 Mar 182483.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Avignon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Périer:
Bishop Jean-François Périer O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Avignon

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013