Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orlando Carretto della Rovere

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon, France

Apostolic Administrator of Orense


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Oct 1509AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
24 Apr 1510AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
1 Oct 1511AppointedApostolic Administrator of Orense, Spain
28 Mar 1512Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
12 Aug 1512AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
1527¹DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orlando Carretto della Rovere
Archbishop Orlando Carretto della Rovere (died 1527) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCastel Sant’Angelo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254, and Page 308
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 126, and Page 124
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 27, Number 86
  • ob/~c2: CB, 26 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018