Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent VI

Étienne Aubert

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1282¹Born
23 Jan 133856.0AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
Oct 1340³58.7AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
20 Sep 134260.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Sep 134260.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Feb 135270.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
18 Dec 135270.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Dec 135270.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Sep 136280.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne Aubert
Pope Étienne Aubert (born 1282, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonts
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Carthusian, Church, Villeneuve-lès-Avignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 10.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1342
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast