Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace-Franšois de Joannis de Verclos

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1733BornAvignon
7 Dec 178855.8SelectedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
30 Mar 178956.1ConfirmedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
19 Apr 178956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
1 May 180168.2DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

MicroData Summary for Ignace-Franšois de Joannis de Verclos
Bishop Ignace-Franšois de Joannis de Verclos (born , died ) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 276
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1789, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016