Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique-Laurent de Balbe de Berton de Crillon

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves, France


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1721SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
24 Sep 1721ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
11 Jan 1722Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
28 Oct 1747DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Laurent de Balbe de Berton de Crillon
Bishop Dominique-Laurent de Balbe de Berton de Crillon (died ) Bishop of Glandèves

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon

  • a bishop for 25.7 years

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018